EP3509466 - ROBOTIC WINDOW-CLEANING SYSTEM AND SAFETY CORD SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2022/28] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAMSON, Shai Haganim Street 2012100 Halutz / IL | 02 /
LEVIN, Asaf Hateenim 20/10 2706411 Kiriat-Bialik / IL | 03 /
LEVIN, Shalom 16 Mishol Hagfanim St. 3030000 Atilit / IL | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/29] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 17757544.6 | 25.08.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP71416 | Priority number, date | GB20160015299 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201615299 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018046316 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509466 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509466 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47L1/00, A47L1/02, A47L3/00, A47L3/04 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
A47L1/00 (EP);
A47L3/04 (EP,GB);
A47L1/02 (EP,GB);
A47L3/00 (EP);
B65H75/42 (GB);
B65H75/4418 (GB);
B65H75/4447 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER FENSTERREINIGUNSSYSTEM UND SICHERHEITSLEINENSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2022/10] | English: | ROBOTIC WINDOW-CLEANING SYSTEM AND SAFETY CORD SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2019/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PURGE À FENÊTRE ROBOT ET SYSTÈME DE LIGNE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2022/10] |
Former [2019/29] | ROBOTISCHES FENSTERREINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND SICHERHEITSSEILSYSTEM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2019/29] | SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE DE FENÊTRE ROBOTIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE DE SÉCURITÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 06.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2017 | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | MT | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | TR | 13.07.2022 | IE | 25.08.2022 | LU | 25.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 25.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006037320 (LEIFHEIT AG [DE]) [A] 1-31* abstract *; | [XA]CN202096151U (TAO REN, et al) [X] 1-11,22-31 * the whole document * [A] 12-21; | [XA]KR20130021041 (KIM SEUNG CHUL [KR]) [X] 1-16,22-31 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-7 * [A] 17-21 |