EP3496731 - COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF PATHOLOGIES OF THE URINARY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfakjn S.r.l. Piazza Repubblica 22 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | [2023/24] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Alfakjn S.r.l. P.zza Repubblica 22 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRARI, Alessio c/o ALFAKJN S.r.l. P.zza Repubblica 22 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | 02 /
GENOVA, Luciano c/o ALFAKJN S.r.l. P.zza Repubblica 22 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.R.L. Piazza Sigmund Freud 1 20154 Milano / IT | [2023/24] |
Former [2019/25] | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.R.L. Piazza Sigmund Freud 1 20154 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17757570.1 | 27.07.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017IB54558 | Priority number, date | IT20160084488 | 10.08.2016 Original published format: IT201600084488 | [2019/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029558 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496731 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496731 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/20, A61K31/7034, A61K31/737, A61K9/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61K35/20 (EP);
A61K31/7034 (EP);
A61K31/737 (EP);
A61K9/0034 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7034, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/737, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61K35/20, A61K31/7034, A61K31/737 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DER HARNWEGE | [2019/25] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF PATHOLOGIES OF THE URINARY SYSTEM | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES DU SYSTÈME URINAIRE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 08.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | IE | 27.07.2023 | IT | 27.07.2023 | LU | 27.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 14.08.2023 | GB | 14.09.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | DE | 01.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
IE | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 14.08.2023 | ||
GB | 14.09.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
IE | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
GB | 14.09.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2010028652 (NANOKO AS [DK], et al) [X] 10 * the whole document * * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-4,6-10; | [XY] - Anonymous, "Health and Beauty: BENEFITS OF COLOSTRUM", (20120617), URL: http://gloriainc.blogspot.de/2012/06/dr.html, (20170619), XP055382843 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4,6-10 | [A] - S TUCCI, "Colostrum in menopause effects on vaginal cytology/symptoms.", CLIN EXP OBSTET GYNECOL., (20130101), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 219 - 221, XP055382837 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - ORIANA CIANI ET AL, "Intravesical administration of combined hyaluronic acid (HA) and chondroitin sulfate (CS) for the treatment of female recurrent urinary tract infections: a European multicentre nested case-control study", BMJ OPEN, (20160301), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1136/bmjopen-2015-009669, ISSN 2044-6055, page e009669, XP055383314 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/bmjopen-2015-009669 |