EP3496898 - CARRIER BODY FOR GRINDING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyrolit - Schleifmittelwerke Swarovski K.G. Swarovskistrasse 33 6130 Schwaz / AT | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCHE, Andreas Walgaustrasse 139 6713 Ludesch / AT | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 17757669.1 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017AT60197 | Priority number, date | AT20160050731 | 11.08.2016 Original published format: AT 507312016 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027250 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496898 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496898 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B24B45/00, B24D5/16 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
B24D5/16 (EP,AT,US);
B24B45/00 (EP,US);
B24D5/10 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERKÖRPER FÜR SCHLEIFWERKZEUGE | [2019/25] | English: | CARRIER BODY FOR GRINDING TOOLS | [2019/25] | French: | CORPS DE SUPPORT POUR OUTILS DE RECTIFICATION | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 25.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19186520.3 / EP3575034 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2017 | AL | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 02.08.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MK | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.08.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2641696 (MUELLER DIAMANTMETALL AG DR [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2810739 (MÜLLER DIAMANTMETALL AG DR [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033]; figure 2 *; | [XAYI]WO2014201087 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-3,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0048]; figures 3-6 * [A] 4-7,10-12 [Y] 8,9 [I] 13 |