08.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
21.08.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
10.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
13.09.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
06.09.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.09.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.09.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
17.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
17.05.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
22.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
26.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|