EP3500526 - METHODS FOR PURIFYING MOLYBDENUM-99 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curium US LLC 111 Westport Plaza, Suite 800 St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBOSA, Luis Antonio M.M. 111 Westport Plaza, Suite 800 St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | 02 /
DEKKER, Frits 111 Westport Plaza, Suite 800 St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | 03 /
GERRITSEN, Marjolijn 111 Westport Plaza, Suite 800 St. Louis, Missouri 63145 / US | 04 /
HERMELER, Mark 111 Westport Plaza, Suite 800 St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/26] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17758686.4 | 14.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US46710 | Priority number, date | US201662375684P | 16.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662375684 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035016 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500526 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500526 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01G39/00, G21G1/00, B01D15/36, B01D15/42 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G21G1/001 (EP,US);
B01D15/363 (EP,US);
B01D15/426 (EP,US);
C01G39/003 (EP,US);
G21G2001/0036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | C01G39/00, G21G1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON MOLYBDÄN-99 | [2019/26] | English: | METHODS FOR PURIFYING MOLYBDENUM-99 | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION DU MOLYBDÈNE-99 | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 13.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5508010 (SAMEH ABDEL H A [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 25 - line 52; table 1 * [A] 8-18 [I] 2,5-7; | [A]WO2012018752 (MALLINCKRODT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 4, paragraph 4th - page 6, paragraph 2nd *; | [A] - SAMEH A A ET AL, "Production techniques of Fission Molybdenum-99", RADIOCHIMICA, OLDENBOURG WISSENSCHAFTSVERLAG GMBH MUNICH, DE, (19870101), vol. 41, doi:10.1524/RACT.1987.41.23.65, ISSN 0033-8230, pages 65 - 72, XP009157928 [A] 1-18 * page 68, column r - page 69, column l; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1524/ract.1987.41.23.65 |