|
22.03.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.03.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
28.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of a new European search report (correction) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
12.01.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
08.09.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Written Opinion of the ISA |
Search / examination |
6 |