EP3425404 - DATA COLLECTION METHOD TO BE USED WHEN CLASSIFYING CANCER LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBAYASHI, Tsuneo 14-3 Takasu 3-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0004 / JP | For all designated states Uchino, Yuriko Sonoda Building 6F 14-3 Takasu 3-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0004 / JP | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Tsuneo Sonoda Building 6F 14-3 Takasu 3-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-0004 / JP | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17759893.5 | 27.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017JP07406 | Priority number, date | JP20160036969 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016036969 | [2019/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017150427 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425404 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N27/447, C12Q1/42, G16B20/00, G01N33/49 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G16B40/20 (EP,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/42 (EP,US);
G01N27/447 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (US);
G16B40/00 (US);
G01N2333/916 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | G01N33/68, G01N27/447, C12Q1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | BEI DER KLASSIFIZIERUNG DES LEBENS VON KREBS ZU VERWENDENDES DATENSAMMELVERFAHREN | [2019/02] | English: | DATA COLLECTION METHOD TO BE USED WHEN CLASSIFYING CANCER LIFE | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE DE DONNÉES À UTILISER LORS DE LA CLASSIFICATIONS DE LA VIE DU CANCER | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | Translation filed | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06331599 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03036301 (NAKATA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003108962 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0006] - [0023] - [0 40] - [0044] - [0 48] , [0 57] - [0068]; figures 1-7; examples 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2005119258 (KATSUTA KIMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document ** paragraph [0135] *; | [YD]JP2006302222 (HANDA TOSHIHIRO) [YD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007029300 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0019] - [0022] - [0030] - [0040] - [0 64] , [0084] - [0094]; examples 1-3; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]JP2007147494 (KATSUTA KIMIO, et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]RU2542505 (G BJUDZHETNOE OBRAZOVATEL NOE UCHREZHDENIE VYSSHEGO PROFESSIONAL NOGO OBRAZOVANIJA NIZHEGORODSKAJA G [RU]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - KOBAYASHI T ET AL, "Prospective investigation of tumor markers and risk assessment in early cancer screening", CANCER, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (19940401), vol. 73, no. 7, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1946 - 1953, XP001055049 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 1947, column left, line fifth - page 1953, column left, line second; figures 1-4; tables 1-4 * | [Y] - D. TRICHOPOULOS, "Plasma C-Reactive Protein and Risk of Cancer: A Prospective Study from Greece", CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY, BIOMARKERS AND PREVENTION., US, (20060201), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1158/1055-9965.EPI-05-0626, ISSN 1055-9965, pages 381 - 384, XP055700956 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 384, paragraphs 2nd - 4th * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1055-9965.EPI-05-0626 | [Y] - LANWEI GUO ET AL, "C-reactive protein and risk of breast cancer: A systematic review and meta-analysis", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150522), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep10508, XP055701043 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep10508 | International search | [A]JPS62100661 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH04244100 (DAIICHI RADIOISOTOPE LAB) [A] 1-14 * , column 3, lines 5 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001289861 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2003/036301 A1 entire text; all drawings *; | [A]JP2002181825 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2003/0108962 A1 entire text; all drawings *; | [A]WO2007029300 (KOBAYASHI TSUNEO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012011485 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , claims & TW 201206427 A *; | [A]JP2012517607 (Onconome, Inc.) [A] 1-14 * , claims & US 2012/0149022 A1 claims & WO 2010/096154 A2 & EP 2398918 A2 *; | [A]JP2015096508 (BIOMERIEUX SA, et al) [A] 1-14* , paragraph [0031] & US 2010/0136539 A1 paragraph [0048] & WO 2009/019365 A2 & EP 2167971 A2 * | by applicant | JP2006302222 |