Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017150475 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017JP07573 | 27.02.2017 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021186971 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017JP07573 | 27.02.2017 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180117158 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017JP07573 | 27.02.2017 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108712866 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017JP07573 | 27.02.2017 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3424350 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | A4 | EP3424350 | 09.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017JP07573 | 27.02.2017 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6256888B | Global Dossier | 10.01.2018 | B2 | JP2017153469 | 07.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016038284 | 29.02.2016 | JP2016203890 | 17.10.2016 |