EP3507524 - MECHANICAL TRANSMISION DEVICE AND SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA CLERMONT Campus de Clermont-Ferrand Les Cézeaux 63170 Aubiere / FR | For all designated states Universite Clermont Auvergne 49 boulevard François Mitterrand CS 60032 63000 Clermont Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUZGARROU, Belhassan Chedli 117 Rue Fontgiève 63000 Clermont Ferrand / FR | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17761072.2 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017EP71899 | Priority number, date | FR20160058089 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: FR 1658089 | [2019/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018041966 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507524 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20, F16H37/16, B25J9/10 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F16H25/2018 (EP);
B25J9/0033 (EP);
B25J9/0069 (EP);
F16H37/16 (EP);
F16H2025/2053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM MIT SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2019/28] | English: | MECHANICAL TRANSMISION DEVICE AND SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE | [2019/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION MÉCANIQUE ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 15.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3159046 (HARNED JOHN L, et al) [A] 1 * figure 22 *; | [A]JPS6396350 (ONUMA KOJI) [A] 1 * figure 7 *; | [A]JPH01228792 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29820787U (SPN SCHWABEN PRAEZISION FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE20101545U (SPN SCHWABEN PRAEZ FRITZ HOPF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2892789 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO2008047066 (MOOG INC [US], et al) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]US2011072920 (GRONLI TIMOTHY D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2957005 (NICOLAS FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1,6-9 * figure 7 *; | [A]FR2957014 (NICOLAS FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1,6-9 * figure 4 * | by applicant | JPH01228792 | DE29820787U | DE20101545U | FR2892789 | FR2957005 | FR2957014 | EP2699071 |