EP3496985 - TRANSPORTATION UNIT TRANSFER SYSTEM WITH RAIL ALIGNMENT MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safe Green Logistics A/S Skivervej 71 9362 Gandrup / DK | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Heine Blach Skivervej 71 9362 Gandrup / DK | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17761449.2 | 11.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017EP70528 | Priority number, date | DK20160070618 | 11.08.2016 Original published format: DK 201670618 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029379 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496985 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496985 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B61D3/20, B61D47/00, B65G63/02 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
B61D47/00 (EP);
B61D3/20 (EP);
B65G63/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM EINER TRANSPORTEINHEIT MIT SCHIENENAUSRICHTUNGSMITTEL | [2019/25] | English: | TRANSPORTATION UNIT TRANSFER SYSTEM WITH RAIL ALIGNMENT MEANS | [2019/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT D'UNITÉ DE TRANSPORT AVEC MOYENS D'ALIGNEMENT DE RAIL | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 11.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 23.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH629446 (LOEVGREN STEN [SE]) [X] 1,4-7,14,15,19,20 * the whole document * [I] 2; | [XI]WO8503692 (LOEVGREN STEN) [X] 1,4-8,20 * the whole document *[I] 2; | [XI]DE3833942 (WAAS HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,14,15,19,20 * the whole document * [I] 2 |