EP3479106 - DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS QUALITY CONTROL OF CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Antares Vision S.p.A. Via del Ferro, 16 25039 Travagliato (BS) / IT | [2019/31] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Antares Vision S.r.l. Via del Ferro, 16 25039 Travagliato (BS) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONARDI, Massimo Loc. Menzino 13 25050 Monte Isola (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
ZORZELLA, Emidio Contrada delle Bassiche 1 25122 Brescia / IT | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Rapisardi, Mariacristina Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17761814.7 | 24.07.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017EP68627 | Priority number, date | IT20160082297 | 04.08.2016 Original published format: IT201600082297 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018024526 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479106 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G01N21/9036 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G01N21/9054 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G01N21/90 (EP,EA);
G01N21/909 (EP,EA,KR,US);
H04N23/56 (US);
H04N5/2625 (US);
G01N2021/845 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN QUALITÄTSKONTROLLE VON BEHÄLTERN | [2019/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS QUALITY CONTROL OF CONTAINERS | [2019/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE CONTINU DE LA QUALITÉ DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 29.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5900945 (HINATA KUNIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008001104 (VOIGT AKSEL [DK], et al); | [A]US2008292178 (SONES RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]DE102012102073 (A20 AG [CH]); | [A]US2014119634 (NUMAZU MASAAKI [JP]); | [Y]US2014125793 (KUROSAWA AKIO [JP], et al); | [A]DE102014216576 (KRONES AG [DE]) |