EP3413519 - NETWORK SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIKISO, Masahiro c/o Furukawa Electric Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Masayuki c/o Furukawa Electric Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17763279.1 | 07.03.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017JP09108 | Priority number, date | JP20160046354 | 09.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016046354 | [2018/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017154939 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413519 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/781, H04L12/715, H04W40/26, H04L12/721, H04W40/28 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
H04L45/52 (EP,US);
H04L45/14 (US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L45/26 (US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L45/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | H04L12/715 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Title | German: | NETZWERKSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/50] | English: | NETWORK SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2018/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2018 | Translation filed | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004167988 (RUNE JOHAN [SE], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0178] *; | [X] - DESILVA S ET AL, "Experimental evaluation of a wireless ad hoc network", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. NINTH INTERNA TIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 16-18 OCT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20001016), doi:10.1109/ICCCN.2000.885540, ISBN 978-0-7803-6494-3, pages 528 - 534, XP010524557 [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [Section 3.2. "Design Choices"]; figure 1 * * paragraph [Section 3.4. "Route Errors and Queuing"] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCCN.2000.885540 | International search | [A]US2004141511 (RUNE JOHAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-8* , & WO 2004/059911 A1 *; | [A]JP2009534991 (Marvell World Trade Ltd.) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0135]; fig. 4 & US 2007/0248065 A1 paragraph [0136]; fig. 4 & WO 2007/127174 A2 & CN 101479999 A *; | [X] - MASASHI ITO et al., "Proposal and Simulation Results of Wireless Mesh Network that Realizes Seamless Handover", Symposium on Multimedia, Distributed, Cooperative and Mobile Systems (DICOMO 2007) Happyo Shiryo, (20070000), URL: http://www.wata-lab.meijo-u.ac.jp/file/convention/2007/200706-DICOMO-Masashi_Ito.pdf, (20170519), XP055420891 [X] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCIT.2007.4392107 |