Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11147811 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2021 | B2 | US2019083490 | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP09428 | 09.03.2017 | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7026609B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2022 | B2 | JPWO2017155020 | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP09428 | 09.03.2017 | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109069431B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B | CN109069431 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP09428 | 09.03.2017 | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3017102 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP09428 | 09.03.2017 | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3427724 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2019 | A4 | EP3427724 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP09428 | 09.03.2017 | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017155020 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI745358B | 11.11.2021 | B | TW201731489 | 16.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016047607 | 10.03.2016 |