|
25.06.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.05.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
21.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
133 |