Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019083436 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SG10201601791W | 08.03.2016 | WO2017SG50112 | 08.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3426241 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2024 | B1 | EP3426241 | 06.11.2019 | A4 | EP3426241 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SG10201601791W | 08.03.2016 | WO2017SG50112 | 08.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201807725W | 30.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | SG10201601791W | 08.03.2016 | WO2017SG50112 | 08.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017155467 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SG10201601791W | 08.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201913528P | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | SG10201601791W | 08.03.2016 | Type | Divisional application |