EP3426858 - A PRE-ASSEMBLED WALL PANEL FOR UTILITY INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Building Technologies, LLC 710 Second Avenue Suite 1400 Seattle, WA 98104-1710 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Arlan 710 Second Avenue Suite 1400 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 02 /
WOERMAN, Mark 710 Second Avenue Suite 1400 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17763914.3 | 07.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017US21179 | Priority number, date | US201662304862P | 07.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304862 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017156016 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426858 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3426858 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/34, E04C2/52, E04F17/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
E04C2/521 (EP,KR,US);
E04C2/52 (US);
E04B1/34321 (KR);
E04B2/26 (US);
E04B2/56 (KR);
E04B2/88 (US);
E04C2/322 (US);
E04C2/3405 (US);
E04C2002/3444 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | E04C2/52, E04B1/343, E04B2/56, E04B2/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORMONTIERTE WANDPLATTE ZUR VERSORGUNGSANLAGENINSTALLATION | [2019/03] | English: | A PRE-ASSEMBLED WALL PANEL FOR UTILITY INSTALLATION | [2019/03] | French: | PANNEAU DE FAÇADE PRÉ-ASSEMBLÉ POUR INSTALLATION DE SERVICE PUBLIC | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22164444.6 / EP4039905 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4018020 (SAUER GALE E, et al) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1,2 ** the whole document *; | [Y]US5519971 (RAMIREZ PETER B [US]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [XI]US8978324 (COLLINS ARLAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,17 * figures 1-16 * * the whole document * [I] 3,5,18-20 | International search | [Y]US4018020 (SAUER GALE E, et al) [Y] 1-3, 5, 8, 10, 12, 14, 15 * entire document *; | [Y]US5519971 (RAMIREZ PETER B [US]) [Y] 1-3, 5, 8, 10, 12,14, 15, 18, 19 * entire document *; | [A]DE19918153 (RUZICKA LUDEK [DE]) [A] 1-25 * see machine translation *; | [A]US2010229472 (MALPAS WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]US2014013684 (KELLY IAN [CA]) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [XY]WO2016032537 (INNOVATIVE BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 16, 17, 20, 21 * entire document * [Y] 18, 19 | by applicant | US4018020 | US5519971 | US8978324 |