EP3426719 - COMPOSITE MATERIALS CONTAINING STRUCTURAL POLYSACCHARIDES AND STRUCTURAL PROTEINS AND FORMED FROM IONIC LIQUID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquette University PO Box 1881 Milwaukee, WI 53201 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Chieu D. 7013 N. Barnett Lane Fox Point, WI 53217 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
TRAN, Chieu, D. 7013 N. Barnett Lane Fox Point WI 53217 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17764084.4 | 09.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017US21552 | Priority number, date | US201662305757P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662305757 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017156256 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426719 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/09, C08L1/02, C08L5/08, C08L89/00, B01J20/24, A61L15/28, A61L15/32, C07B57/00, A61P31/04 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A61L15/225 (EP,US);
A01N43/16 (US);
A01N37/18 (US);
A01N59/16 (US);
A01N59/20 (US);
A61L15/18 (US);
A61L15/44 (US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/24 (EP,US);
B01J20/28007 (EP,US);
C07B57/00 (EP,US);
C08L1/02 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C08L89/00 (EP,US);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2400/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/225, C08L1/00 (EP,US);
A61L15/225, C08L5/08 (US,EP);
A61L15/225, C08L89/00 (US,EP);
C08L1/02, C08L89/00 (US,EP);
C08L5/00, C08L89/00 (US,EP);
C08L5/08, C08L1/02, C08L89/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/08, C08L1/02, C08L89/06 (EP,US);
C08L5/08, C08L89/00 (EP,US);
C08L89/00, C08L1/02 (US,EP);
C08L89/00, C08L5/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE MIT STRUKTURELLEN POLYSACCHARIDEN UND STRUKTURELLEN PROTEINEN, HERGESTELLT AUS IONISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/03] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIALS CONTAINING STRUCTURAL POLYSACCHARIDES AND STRUCTURAL PROTEINS AND FORMED FROM IONIC LIQUID COMPOSITIONS | [2019/03] | French: | MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES CONTENANT DES POLYSACCHARIDES STRUCTURAUX ET DES PROTÉINES STRUCTURELLES ET FORMÉS À PARTIR DE COMPOSITIONS DE LIQUIDE IONIQUE | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO2018075614 [ ] (UNIV MARQUETTE [US], et al); | [E]EP3528856 (UNIV MARQUETTE [US]) | International search | [X]WO2004084627 (UNIV ALABAMA [US]) [X] 1-3, 14, 17, 18, 23 * , claims, examples 1-8 *; | [A]WO2014186702 (UNIV MARQUETTE [US]) [A] 1-3, 14-29* , claims *; | [XY] - ROSEWALD MEGHANN et al., "Cellulose-Chitosan-Keratin Composite Materials: Synthesis, Immunological and Antibacterial Properties", ECS Transactions, (20140000), vol. 64, no. 4, pages 499 - 505, XP055423639 [X] 1-3, 14, 17, 18, 20 [Y] 15, 16, 19, 21, 22, 24- 29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/06404.0499ecst | [X] - WU RONG-LAN et al., "Cellulose/Soy Protein Isolate Blend Films Prepared via Room- Temperature Ionic Liquid", Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (20090000), vol. 48, pages 7132 - 7136, XP055423646 [X] 1-3, 14, 17, 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie9001052 | [Y] - PENG SHUAI et al., "Nanoporous Magnetic Cellulose-Chitosan Composite Microspheres: Preparation, Characterization, and Application for Cu(II) Adsorption", Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (20140000), vol. 53, pages 2106 - 2113, XP055423648 [Y] 15, 16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie402855t | [Y] - VENKATESWARLU SADA et al., "Surfactant-Free Green Synthesis of Fe304 Nanoparticles capped with 3,4-Dihydroxyphenethylcarbamodithioate: Stable Recyclable Magnetic Nanoparticles for Rapid and Efficient Removal of Hg(II) Ions from Water", Dalton Trans., (20150000), vol. 44, pages 18427 - 18437, XP055423727 [Y] 15, 16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5DT03155A | [Y] - TRAN CHIEU D. et al., "Chitosan-cellulose composite materials: preparation, characterization and application for removal of microcystin", J. Hazard Mater, (20130515), pages 355 - 366, XP028541011 [Y] 19, 25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2013.02.046 | [Y] - DURI SIMON et al., "Enantiomeric Selective Adsorption of Amino Acid by Polysaccharide Composite Materials", Langmuir, (20140000), vol. 30, pages 642 - 650, XP055423731 [Y] 21, 22, 27-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la404003t | [Y] - TRAN CHIEU D. et al., "Recyclable Synthesis, Characterization, and Antimicrobial Activity of Chitosan-based Polysaccharide Composite Materials", J. Biomed. Materials Res. A, (20130000), vol. 0, no. 8, pages 2248 - 2257, XP055423732 [Y] 24, 26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.34520 | by applicant | WO2004084627 | WO2014186702 | WO2018075614 | - WU et al., "disclose cellulose/soy protein isolate blend films prepared via room-temperature ionic liquid", Industrial & Engineering Chemistry Research, (20090000), vol. 48, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ie9001052, pages 7132 - 7136, XP055423646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie9001052 | - PENG et al., "disclose nanoporous magnetic cellulose-chitosan composite microspheres", Industrial & Engineering Chemistry Research, (20140000), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 2106 - 2113 | - VENKATESWARLU et al., "disclose the surfactant-free green synthesis of Fe O nanoparticles capped with 3,4-dihydroxyphenethylcarbamodithioate", Dalton Trans., (20150000), vol. 44, pages 18427 - 18437 | - TRAN et al., J. Biomed. Mater. Res., (20130000), vol. 101A, pages 2248 - 2257 | - TRAN et al., J. of Hazard. Mat., (20130000), vol. 252-253, pages 355 - 366 | - DURI et al., Langmuir, (20140000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 642 - 650 | - DURI et al., "Supramolecular Composition Materials from Cellulose, Chitosan, and Cyclodextrins: Facile Preparation and Their Selective Inclusion Complex Formation with Endocrine Disruptors", Langmuir, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 16, pages 5037 - 49 | - TRAN et al., "Synthesis, structure and antimicrobial property of green composites from cellulose, wool, hair and chicken feather", Carbohydrate Polymers, (20160000), vol. 151, doi:10.1016/j.carbpol.2016.06.021, pages 1269 - 1276, XP029661848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2016.06.021 | - VILAPLANA, F.STROEMBERG, E.KARLSSON, S., "Environmental and resource aspects of sustainable biocomposites", Polymer Degradation and Stability, (20100000), vol. 95, no. 11, pages 2147 - 2161, XP027406400 | - XIE, H.LI, S.ZHANG, S., "Ionic liquids as novel solvents for the dissolution and blending of wool keratin fibers", Green Chemistry, (20050000), vol. 7, doi:10.1039/b502547h, pages 606 - 608, XP002478761 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b502547h | - TRAN et al., "One-Pot Synthesis of Biocompatible Silver Nanoparticle Composites from Cellulose and Keratin: Characterization and Antimicrobial Activity", Applied Materials & Interfaces, (20160000), vol. 8, doi:10.1021/acsami.6b14347, pages 34791 - 34801, XP055905333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsami.6b14347 | - KORTE, D.BRUZZONITI, M. C.SARZANINI, C.FRANKO, M., "Thermal Lens Spectrometric Determination of Colloidal and Ionic Silver in Water", Int. J. Thermophys., (20110000), vol. 32, pages 818 - 827 | US19570623057 |