EP3507565 - PROJECTILE WITH PENETRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saltech AG Güterstrasse 20 4658 Däniken / CH | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADELMANN, Roger August Lindenrain 13 4629 Fulenbach / CH | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Piticco, Lorena Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17764359.0 | 01.09.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017EP71973 | Priority number, date | EP20160187018 | 02.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16187018 | [2019/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018042000 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507565 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3507565 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/06 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F42B12/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHOSS MIT PENETRATOR | [2019/28] | English: | PROJECTILE WITH PENETRATOR | [2019/28] | French: | PROJECTILE COMPRENANT UN PENETRATEUR | [2022/22] |
Former [2019/28] | PROJECTILE MUNI D'UN PÉNÉTRATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 13.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0343389 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]) [I] 1,2,11-13,16* column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [I]IL79191 (ROYAL ORDNANCE PLC [GB]) [I] 1-4,6-8,10-18 * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2016153757 (MAHNKE JOSHUA [US]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0070] - [0088] - [0243] - [0254]; figures 33-36 * | by applicant | US3782287 | WO9741404 | US6374743 | WO2006010424 |