EP3512628 - DEVICE AND USE OF THE DEVICE FOR PREHEATING AT LEAST ONE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERN, Matthias Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
KOLIOS, Grigorios Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Sabine Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
LAIB, Heinrich Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
SCHEIFF, Frederik Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
ZOELS, Bernd Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17764612.2 | 12.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017EP72887 | Priority number, date | EP20160188612 | 13.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16188612 | [2019/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018050635 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512628 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, F28F7/02, F28F21/04 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
F28F7/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/0013 (KR);
B01J6/008 (US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,KR);
B01J8/0221 (EP,KR);
B01J8/025 (EP,KR);
B01J8/0285 (EP,KR);
C01B3/24 (EP,US);
C09C1/54 (US);
F28F21/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2208/00176 (EP,KR);
B01J2208/00194 (EP,KR);
B01J2208/00407 (EP,KR);
B01J2208/00415 (EP,KR);
B01J2208/0053 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00092 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00135 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00247 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/0272 (US);
C01B2203/0833 (US);
C01B2203/1241 (US);
F28D2021/0022 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG DER VORRICHTUNG ZUM VORERWÄRMEN MINDESTENS EINES FLUIDS | [2019/30] | English: | DEVICE AND USE OF THE DEVICE FOR PREHEATING AT LEAST ONE FLUID | [2019/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉCHAUFFAGE D'AU MOINS UN FLUIDE ET UTILISATION DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 15.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0363066 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1,8-13,15,17 * column 2, line 32 - column 7, line 20 * * column 10, line 11 - column 10, line 58 * * figure - *[I] 2-7,14,16; | [XI]US5270016 (ALAGY JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-13,17 * column 11, line 63 - column 12, line 4 * * column 13, line 24 - column 15, line 15 * * figure 1c * [I] 3,4,14; | [XI]WO2004091773 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-13,15-17 * page 5, line 8 - page 12, line 27 * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 24 * * page 18, line 1 - line 26 * * figure - * [I] 2-4,14; | [XI]WO2014002090 (YEDA RES & DEV) [X] 1,8-13,15,17 * page 8, line 31 - page 16, line 8; figure - * [I] 2-7,14,16 | by applicant | WO2011089209 | - RIDGWAY, K.; K. J. TARBUCK., "Radial voidage variation in randomly-packed beds of spheres of different sizes", Journal of Pharmacy and Pharmacology, (19660000), vol. 18.S1, pages 168S - 175S |