EP3496527 - OFF-GROUND CULTIVATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/25] | SOILLESS CULTURE SYSTEM | ||
[2021/29] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cimbaro, Yohann 46 Rue Lyautey 97490 Saint-Clotilde / FR | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17764861.5 | 24.07.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017FR52035 | Priority number, date | FR20160057636 | 08.08.2016 Original published format: FR 1657636 | [2019/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029409 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496527 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/02, A01G9/24 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A01G31/02 (EP);
A01G9/249 (EP);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A01G31/02, A01G7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | ERDLOSES KULTURSYSTEM | [2019/25] | English: | OFF-GROUND CULTIVATION SYSTEM | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CULTURE HORS-SOL | [2021/31] |
Former [2019/25] | SOILLESS CULTURE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/25] | SYSTEME DE CULTURE HORS-SOL | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 21.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3973353 (DEDOLPH RICHARD R) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1-23 * * column 4, line 7 - column 15, line 59 * [Y] 9 [I] 3; | [XI]CN101836560 (UNIV BEIHANG) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] * [I] 3; | [XI]US8516743 (GIACOMANTONIO PAUL J [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * column 8, line 50 - column 12, line 8 * [I] 3; | [XY]EP3005866 (REPUBLIC OF KOREA NAT FISHERIES RES AND DEV [KR]) [X] 2 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0114] - [0128] *[Y] 9 |