EP3432378 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd. 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | ||
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumikin Chemical Co., Ltd. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADA Masashi c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA Yuichi c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 03 /
NOGUCHI Katsuhide c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17766160.0 | 10.02.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP04980 | Priority number, date | JP20160050402 | 15.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016050402 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159152 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432378 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/54, C09K11/06, C07D487/04 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H10K85/654 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/00 (US);
H10K50/10 (EP,KR);
H10K50/11 (US);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K50/165 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/657 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
H10K2101/90 (EP,US);
H10K2102/103 (EP,US);
H10K50/166 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | H01L51/50, C09K11/06, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT | [2019/04] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT | [2019/04] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102009023155 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]DE102009031021 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2015170930 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [KR]); | [E]EP3335254 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | International search | [A]WO2008056746 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2012528088 ; | [XA]JP2012531383 ; | [EX]WO2017025164 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO2009116377 | WO2010134350 | WO2011070963 | WO2011099374 | WO2013175746 | WO2013175747 | WO2013JP53051 |