EP3431786 - BALL JOINT AND STABILIZER LINK USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 10, Fukuura 3-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURODA, Shigeru c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD. 10 Fukuura 3-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17766459.6 | 07.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP09031 | Priority number, date | JP20160050213 | 14.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016050213 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159458 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431786 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, B60G7/00, F16C11/10 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
F16C11/0685 (EP);
F16C11/06 (KR);
F16C11/0638 (EP,US);
B60G7/00 (EP);
B60G7/005 (KR,US);
F16C11/0657 (EP);
F16C11/10 (KR);
B60G2204/416 (US);
F16C2220/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | KUGELGELENK UND STABILISATORVERBINDUNG DAMIT | [2019/04] | English: | BALL JOINT AND STABILIZER LINK USING SAME | [2019/04] | French: | JOINT À ROTULE ET LIAISON DE STABILISATEUR L'UTILISANT | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2018 | Translation filed | 12.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55137715U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,3,4,6* the whole document *; | [X]US2007274770 (SAGISAKA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2008138150 (BUDDE FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0040] , [0041]; figures 7,8 * [I] 10; | [X]EP2722540 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] , [0038]; figures 4A-D * | International search | [XY]JPS5468075U (Fuji Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha) [X] 1-4, 6 * , fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 5, 7-10; | [Y]JPS6319416 (TRW EHRENREICH GMBH) [Y] 5, 7-10 * , fig. 1 to 8 & US 4695181 A fig. 1 to 8 & EP 213314 A2 *; | [Y]JPS6342921U (Rhythm Motor Parts Manufacturing Co., Ltd.) [Y] 7-10 * , fig. 2(i) to (ro) (i, ro: Japanese Katakana) (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0575512U (Beyonz Corp.) [Y] 10 * , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011141020 (SOMIC ISHIKAWA INC) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013137003 (ISHIKAWA TEKKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-10* , fig. 2 to 3 & US 2015/0063899 A1 fig. 2 to 3 * |