EP3414684 - METHODS AND A COMPUTING DEVICE FOR DETERMINING WHETHER A MARK IS GENUINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sys-Tech Solutions, Inc. One Research Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2022/18] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states SYS-Tech Solutions, Inc. One Research Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGT, Matthias 30 Merion Place Lawrenceville NJ 08648 / US | 02 /
SOBORSKI, Michael, L. 8 Philip Court Allentown NJ 08501 / US | 03 /
AYOUB, Rafik 11 Millstone Road Princeton Junction NJ 08550 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17767261.5 | 13.03.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US22097 | Priority number, date | US201662307901P | 14.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662307901 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017160715 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414684 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K19/08, G06K19/10, G06Q30/00, G06T1/00 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
G06V20/80 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06K7/1434 (IL,KR,RU);
G06F18/22 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06F18/23 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06K7/1413 (IL,KR,RU);
G06K7/1417 (IL,KR,RU);
G06V10/143 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06V10/431 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06V10/761 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | G06F17/30, G06K19/06, G06K19/08, G06K19/10, G06Q30/00, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ECHTHEIT EINER MARKIERUNG | [2018/51] | English: | METHODS AND A COMPUTING DEVICE FOR DETERMINING WHETHER A MARK IS GENUINE | [2018/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE DE DÉTERMINATION D'AUTHENTICITÉ D'UNE MARQUE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 06.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 11.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/20] | Divisional application(s) | EP22160094.3 / EP4057206 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103279731 (GALAXYCORE INC); | [A]US2014086474 (LE DUY P [US]); | [I]US2015262347 (DUERKSEN GARY L [US], et al); | [A]US2015379321 (SOBORSKI MICHAEL L [US]); | [A]WO2016035774 (NEC CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]US2011121066 (TIAN YIBIN [US], et al); | [A]US2015083901 (SMITH FRASER M [US]); | [A]WO2015130697 (SYS TECH SOLUTIONS INC [US]); | [A]US2015262347 (DUERKSEN GARY L [US], et al); | [A]US2015379321 (SOBORSKI MICHAEL L [US]) |