EP3442542 - NANOPARTICLES, CONTROLLED-RELEASE DOSAGE FORMS, AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING AN IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Zhen 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | 02 /
WANG, Chao 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | 03 /
YE, Yanqi 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Creek, Isobel Clare The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17767464.5 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017US22568 | Priority number, date | US201662308513P | 15.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662308513 P | US201662380711P | 29.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662380711 P | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161032 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442542 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K31/7115, A61K31/7125, A61K47/50, C07H21/00, A61K9/51, A61P35/00 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/6949 (EP,US);
A61K9/0021 (EP,US);
A61K9/513 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/39, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/39] | A61K31/7115, A61K31/7125, A61K47/50, C07H21/00, A61K9/51 | ||
Former IPC [2019/08] | A61K31/7115, A61K31/7125, A61K47/50, C07H21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKEL, DOSIERUNGSFORM MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FREISETZUNG EINES IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIKUMS | [2019/08] | English: | NANOPARTICLES, CONTROLLED-RELEASE DOSAGE FORMS, AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING AN IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC AGENT | [2019/08] | French: | NANOPARTICULES, FORMES POSOLOGIQUES À LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE ET PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN AGENT IMMUNOTHÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016010788 (US HEALTH [US]) | International search | [Y]US2009182306 (LEE JEONG WOO [US], et al); | [Y]US2010311168 (SAMUEL JAYAKUMAR P [US], et al); | [Y]US2011195030 (MUMPER RUSSELL J [US], et al); | [Y]US2013210896 (BADIE BEHNAM [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015153975 (AURASENSE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]); | [Y]US2016058784 (PRIMIANO II THOMAS [US], et al); | [XY]US2016067358 (MUKHERJEE PINKU [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2016010788 | US2016067358 |