EP3522859 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITION FOR A KERATIN SUBSTRATE COMPRISING CONDITIONING, COLOR PROTECTING AND STYLING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP Investments LLC 1011 Centre Road Suite 315 Wilmington, Delaware 19805 / US | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHATUN, Amna 816 Huddersfield Road Ravensthorpe West Yorkshire WF13 3LY / GB | 02 /
FRANZKE, Michael Avenue Carnisse 314 2993 ML Barendrecht / NL | 03 /
KULCSAR, Lidia 52 Kevin Drive Flanders, New Jersey 07836 / US | 04 /
KROON, Gijsbert Neerpolderseweg 2C 3381 JS Giessenburg / NL | 05 /
FOLTIS, Linda C. 15 Van Riper Place Nutley, New Jersey 07110 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 17767468.6 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US22575 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/33] | US201662307843P | 14.03.2016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161036 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522859 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/00, C08F222/38, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/12 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/8147 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8188 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/004 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F222/38 (KR,US);
A61K2800/5424 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/60, C08F220/06, C08F220/387 (EP);
C08F220/60, C08F220/585, C08F216/1475 (EP);
C08F220/60, C08F220/585, C08F220/387 (EP);
C08F220/60, C08F220/585, C08F220/60 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2019/33] | A61K8/42, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00, C08F222/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EIN KERATINSUBSTRAT MIT KONDITIONIERUNG, FARBSCHUTZ UND STYLINGPOLYMER | [2019/33] | English: | PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITION FOR A KERATIN SUBSTRATE COMPRISING CONDITIONING, COLOR PROTECTING AND STYLING POLYMER | [2019/33] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SOIN PERSONNEL POUR SUBSTRAT KÉRATINIQUE COMPRENANT UN POLYMÈRE D'APRÈS-SHAMPOOING, DE PROTECTION DES COULEURS ET DE COIFFAGE | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 13.11.2018 | Date of receipt | 15.07.2019 | Request rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4889887 (FAN YOU-LING [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,14 * claim 1 * * example 13 *; | [X]US4959432 (FAN YOU-LING [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,14 * column 1, lines 58-63 * * example 14 *; | [X]CA1302003 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14 * claim 1 * * claim 19 *; | [Y]US6852815 (CHUANG JUI-CHANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1 * * examples 3-10 ** column 1, lines 35-37 *; | [Y]WO2014071354 (HERCULES INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] * * Shampoo formulation 2; page 16; table 6 * * paragraph [0045] * | International search | [A]WO0105851 (CALGON CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2003022987 (MATZ GARY F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6852815 (CHUANG JUI-CHANG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; col 1 lines 12-14, col 1 lines 29-33, col 5 lines 17-18, col 6 lines 16-17, col 9 lines 30-32, example 1, example 2, example 11, example 27, example 28 *; | [A]US2013209388 (ERAZO-MAJEWICZ PAQUITA [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 14-20 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0027], para [0032], para [0043], para [0072], para [0091] *; | [A]US2013266531 (YUAN-HUFFMAN QINGWEN WENDY [US], et al) [A] 12-13 * ; para [0001], para [0078], para [0079], para [0081] *; | [A]US2015297496 (KROON GIJSBERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, but especially: claim 7, claim 8, claim 12, claim 17, claim 20, claim 21, claim 22, claim 24, claim 27 *; | [A] - RIGOLETTO et al., "Polyquaternium-69: A New Fixative Polymer with Enhanced Styling Benefits", Cosmetic Science Technology- Polymers, (20070000), pages 142 - 156, XP007910768 [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, but especially: fig. 1 * |