EP3509885 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE INTERNAL PRESSURE OF A SERVICE FLUID CONTAINER, AND SERVICE FLUID CONTAINER SYSTEM WITH AN INTERNAL PRESSURE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG Kautexstrasse 52 53229 Bonn / DE | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDEVANG, Poul Adelheidsstrasse 99 53229 Bonn / DE | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 20 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17768042.8 | 05.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP72260 | Priority number, date | DE201610216860 | 06.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016216860 | [2019/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018046502 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509885 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B60K15/03519 (EP,KR,US);
B60K15/077 (KR);
B60K2015/0321 (KR);
B60K2015/03236 (KR);
B60K2015/03256 (KR);
B60K2015/03328 (KR);
B60K2015/03514 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2015/03571 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2015/0358 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INNENDRUCKSTEUERUNG EINES BETRIEBSFLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERS UND BETRIEBSFLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERSYSTEM MIT INNENDRUCKSTEUERUNG | [2019/29] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE INTERNAL PRESSURE OF A SERVICE FLUID CONTAINER, AND SERVICE FLUID CONTAINER SYSTEM WITH AN INTERNAL PRESSURE CONTROLLER | [2019/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA PRESSION INTERNE D'UN RÉSERVOIR DE LIQUIDE DE TRAVAIL ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSERVOIR DE LIQUIDE DE TRAVAIL MUNI D'UNE RÉGULATION DE LA PRESSION INTERNE | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 22.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE19930926 (ALFMEIER PRAEZISION AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,10,11 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 57; figure - * [A] 3,12 [Y] 5,6,9; | [XY]DE10247935 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 3,4,6,9 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0025]; figure 1 * [Y] 6,9; | [Y]DE102010019831 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figure - * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0011] ** figure 1 *; | [XA]DE102011084732 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0 33] - [0038]; figure 1 * [A] 3,12 |