14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
16.09.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
08.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
19.03.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
19.03.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
27.02.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
09.10.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.06.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
21.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|