EP3510027 - DI-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FGH BioTech, Inc. 16720 Hedgecroft, 208 Houston, TX 77060 / US | [2022/14] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states FGH Biotech, Inc. 414 Thamer Circle Houston, Texas 77024-6918 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESUGI, Motonari 414 Thamer Circle Houston, TX 77024-6918 / US | 02 /
KINCAID, John 414 Thamer Circle Houston, TX 77024-6918 / US | 03 /
HUFF, Joel 179 Spiritual Pass Spring Branch Texas 78070 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2019/29] | 01 /
UESUGI, Motonari 414 Thamer Circle Houston, TX 770204-6918 / US | ||
02 /
KINCAID, John 414 Thamer Circle Houston, TX 77024-6918 / US | |||
03 /
HUFF, Joel 179 Spiritual Pass Spring Branch Texas 78070 / US | Representative(s) | Petty, Catrin Helen, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17768620.1 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US50562 | Priority number, date | US201662384661P | 07.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384661 P | US201662438944P | 23.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438944 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018049080 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510027 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3510027 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D405/14, C07D401/14, A61P35/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4412 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | C07D405/14, C07D401/04, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4412, A61P3/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DI-SUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2019/29] | English: | DI-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES | [2019/29] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PYRAZOLE DI-SUBSTITUÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 27.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2008097835 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-33,35-38 * abstract * * examples 1-10 * * claims 1-28 * * figures 1-28 * [A] 3,34; | [A]WO2011051961 (CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * examples 1-420 * * claims 1-45 *; | [YA]WO2015031710 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-33,35-38 * abstract * * page 23, lines 18-24 * * examples 1-17 * * claims 1-39 * [A] 3,34; | [YA]US2015065519 (CHAKRAVARTY SARVAJIT [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-33,35-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0 49] , [ 363] - [0371] * * pages 29-53; tables 1-36 * [A] 3,34; | [A]WO2016106331 (USA [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * pages 79-383; tables 1, 2; compounds 1-828 ** claims 1-52 * | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5639480 | US5674533 | US5733566 | US5739108 | US5891474 | US5922356 | US5972891 | US5980945 | US5993855 | US6045830 | US6087324 | US6113943 | US6197350 | US6248363 | US6264970 | US6267981 | US6376461 | US6419961 | US6589548 | US6613358 | US6699500 | - DEBOSE-BOYD et al., Cell, (19990000), vol. 99, no. 7, page 703 | - SAKAI et al., Cell, (19960000), vol. 85, page 1037 | - YABE et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 20, page 12753 | - YANG et al., Cell, (20020000), vol. 110, pages 489 - 500 | - EBERLE et al., Biochimie, (20040000), vol. 86, no. 11, page 839 | - SHAO W.; ESPENSHADE PJ., Cell Metab., (20120000), vol. 16, page 414 | - ZHAO et al., Diabetes, (20140000), vol. 63, page 2464 | - PADWAL et al., Lancet, (20070000), vol. 369, page 9555 | - TAKAHASHI Y; FUKUSATO T, "Histopathology of nonalcoholic fatty liver disease/nonalcoholic steatohepatitis", World J Gastroenterol, (20141114), vol. 20, no. 42, pages 15539 - 48 | - SCHREUDER et al., World J Gastroenterol, (20080000), vol. 14, no. 16, page 2474 | - EKSTEDT et al., Hepatology, (20060000), vol. 44, no. 4, page 865 | - AJUFO et al., Lancet Diabetes Endocrinol., (20160500), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 436 - 46 | - KOLANSKY et al., Am J Cardiol., (20081201), vol. 102, no. 11, pages 1438 - 43 | - URBAN et al., JAm Coll Cardiol., (20131015), vol. 62, no. 16, pages 1401 - 8 | - ABIFADEL M et al., Nat Genet., (20030600), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 154 - 6 | - COHEN et al., Nat Genet., (20050200), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 161 - 5 | - GABITOVA et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20140000), vol. 20, no. 1, page 28 | - MENENDEZ, J. A.; LUPU, R., Nat Rev Cancer, (20070000), vol. 7, page 763 | - MEDES et al., Cancer Research, (19530000), vol. 13, page 27 | - BRUSSELMANS et al., Cancer Research, (20050000), vol. 65, pages 6719 - 6725 | - KUHAJ DA et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 3450 - 3454 | - MENENDEZ et al., Int J Cancer, (20050000), vol. 115, pages 19 - 35 | - TANG et al., Cell Metabol, (20110000), vol. 13, page 44 | - KAMISUKI et al., Chem Biol., (20090000), vol. 16, pages 882 - 92 | - KAMISUKI et al., J. Med Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, page 4923 | - LI et al., Mol Cancer Ther., (20140000), vol. 13, no. 4, page 855 | - LI et al., Oncotarget., (20150000), vol. 6, no. 38, page 41018 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - LIJINSKY, Food Cosmet. Toxicol., (19820000), vol. 20, page 393 | - LIJINSKY, J. Nat. Cancer Inst., (19820000), vol. 69, page 1127 | - MANGOLD, Mutation Res., (19940000), vol. 308, page 33 | - GORDON, Drug Metab. Dispos., (19870000), vol. 15, page 589 | - ZELLO, Metabolism, (19940000), vol. 43, page 487 | - GATELY, J. Nucl. Med., (19860000), vol. 27, page 388 | - WADED, Chem. Biol. Interact., (19990000), vol. 117, page 191 | - FOSTER et al., Adv. Drug Res., (19850000), vol. 14, pages 1 - 36 | - KUSHNER et al., Can. J. Physiol. Pharmacol., (19990000), vol. 77, pages 79 - 88 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, Marcel Dekker, (19950000), page 379 80 | - SEFTON, CRC Crit. Ref. Biomed. Eng., (19870000), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD et al., Surgery, (19800000), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (19890000), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (19840000), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 |