EP3500513 - LIFTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WIND TURBINE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOELLER, Jesper Nørregårdsvej 78 7330 Brande / DK | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Wind Power GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17768742.3 | 12.09.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017EP72802 | Priority number, date | DE201610220628 | 20.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016220628 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018072927 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500513 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/10, B66C13/08, F03D13/10 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B66C1/108 (EP,US);
B66C13/08 (EP,US);
B66C13/085 (US);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F05B2230/604 (US);
F05B2230/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | HEBEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR WINDTURBINENKOMPONENTEN | [2019/26] | English: | LIFTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WIND TURBINE COMPONENTS | [2019/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE LEVAGE POUR COMPOSANTS D'ÉOLIENNE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 20.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1925582 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE202014105459U (EMATEC MANFRED EBERHARD MASCHINEN UND GREIFTECHNIK E K [DE]); | [Y]CA2956875 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP1925582 | EP2084098 |