EP3481780 - RECIRCULATING, PURIFYING, DISINFECTING, COOLING, DECONTAMINATING, FEEDBACK CONTROLLED WATER SYSTEM FOR DRINKING WATER AND OTHER USES TO IMPROVE HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF ANIMALS AND HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wet Holdings (Global) Limited Greville House 11 Abbey Hill Kenilworth CV8 1LU / GB | [2020/42] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Curozone Ireland Limited 47 Mount Eagle Green Leopardstown Heights Dublin 18 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, Stephen 47 Mount Eagle Green Leopardstown Heights Dublin 18 / IE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Robert Michael Harrison & Company 22 The Grange Road Leeds LS16 6HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 17769116.9 | 11.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017IB00994 | Priority number, date | US201662360893P | 11.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662360893 P | US201762529684P | 07.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762529684 P | US201715645885 | 10.07.2017 Original published format: US201715645885 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018011629 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3481780 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3481780 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/78, C02F9/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/32, C02F1/44, C02F1/467, C02F1/50, C02F1/72 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F1/006 (US);
C02F1/008 (US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
C02F2209/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REZIRKULIERENDES, REINIGENDES, DESINFIZIERENDES, KÜHLENDES, DEKONTAMINIERENDES RÜCKKOPPLUNGSGESTEUERTES BRAUCHWASSERSYSTEM FÜR TRINKWASSER UND ANDERE VERWENDUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GESUNDHEIT UND DES WOHLBEFINDENS VON TIEREN UND MENSCHEN | [2019/20] | English: | RECIRCULATING, PURIFYING, DISINFECTING, COOLING, DECONTAMINATING, FEEDBACK CONTROLLED WATER SYSTEM FOR DRINKING WATER AND OTHER USES TO IMPROVE HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF ANIMALS AND HUMANS | [2019/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RECIRCULATION, PURIFICATION, DÉSINFECTION, REFROIDISSEMENT, DÉCONTAMINATION D'EAU COMMANDÉ PAR RÉTROACTION POUR EAU POTABLE ET AUTRES UTILISATIONS POUR AMÉLIORER LA SANTÉ ET LE BIEN-ÊTRE D'ANIMAUX ET D'HUMAINS | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 11.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | LU | 11.07.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013086217 (MASCO CORP [US]) [A] 17-22 * abstract ** paragraphs 66, 67, 111, 127-129 *; | [XI]WO2015004761 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-26 * abstract * * paragraphs 26, 27, 54, 55, 75 * [I] 4,6,8; | [A] - Bruce T Stanley, "ELECTROLYTIC OZONE GENERATION AND ITS APPLICATION IN PURE WATER SYSTEMS", (20130101), URL: http://www.ozonia.com/media/pdf/app/pure_water-e.pdf, (20170914), XP055406512 [A] 2 * abstract * * This document can also be retrieved on webarchive with a snapshot from April 24th, 2013. See https://web.archive.org/web/20130424095114/http://www.ozonia.com/media/pdf/app/pure_water-e.pdf * | by applicant | - SCALLAN E.; HOEKSTRA R. M.; ANGULO F. J.; TAUXE R. V.; WIDDOWSON M. A.; ROY S. L.; JONES J. L., "Griffin P. M. Foodborne illness acquired in the United States-major pathogens", Emerg. Infect. Dis, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 7 - 15 |