EP3435227 - LANGUAGE RECOGNITION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jinpeng Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 02 /
HOU, Zhenyu Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17769359.5 | 16.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017CN76873 | Priority number, date | CN201610179961 | 25.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610179961 | [2019/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162082 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435227 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G06F40/211 (EP,US);
G06F40/279 (KR);
G06F40/42 (CN);
G06F40/58 (US);
G06F40/253 (US);
G06F8/43 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | G06F9/45 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2019/05] | English: | LANGUAGE RECOGNITION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2019/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, ET SYSTÈME DE RECONNAISSANCE DE LANGUE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2018 | Translation filed | 24.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 25.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2022 | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/45] | 22.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1324213 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030]; figure 2A. 2B * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3 *; | [A]US6957184 (SCHMID PHILIPP HEINZ [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]US2012191446 (BINSZTOK HENRI [FR], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract *; | [A] - BROWN M ET AL, "CONTEXT-FREE GRAMMAR COMPILER SPEECH UNDERSTANDING SYSTEMS", ICSLP 94 : 1994 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING. YOKOHAMA, JAPAN, SEPT. 18 - 22, 1994; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING. (ICSLP)], YOKOHAMA : ASJ, JP, (19940918), vol. 1, pages 21 - 24, XP000855177 [A] 9 * abstract * * section 3.1 * | [I] - YE-YI WANG ET AL, "Grammar learning for spoken language understanding", AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING, 2001. ASRU '01. IEEE W ORKSHOP ON 9-13 DEC. 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20011209), ISBN 978-0-7803-7343-3, pages 292 - 295, XP010603734 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN102629213 (BEIJING HIRAIN TECHNOLOGIES CO) [A] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0033]-[0065] *; | [A]CN103092669 (ZHENJIANG HUAYANG INF TECH CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015160934 (BEIT-AHARON JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |