EP3433136 - SAFETY BELT RETRACTOR WITH A LOAD LIMITING DEVICE AND VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Technologies (Shanghai) Co., Ltd 3F, 366 Taibo Road Jiading District Shanghai 201814 / CN | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Yong Room 502, No. 28 Lane 218 Baochun Road Minhang District Shanghai 201199 / CN | [2019/10] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
HAN, Yong Room 502, No. 28 Lane 218 Spring Road Minhang District Shanghai 201199 / CN | Representative(s) | ZF Patentabteilung - DIPS ZF Automotive Germany GmbH Industriestraße 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | ZF TRW Patentabteilung TRW Automotive GmbH Industriestraße 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17769444.5 | 22.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017CN77678 | Priority number, date | CN201610167542 | 23.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610167542 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162167 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433136 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/34, B60R22/44, B60R22/28, B60R22/46 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
B60R22/4676 (EP,US);
B60R22/34 (CN);
B60R22/3413 (US);
B60R22/28 (EP);
B60R22/44 (CN);
B60R22/46 (EP);
B60R2022/287 (EP,US);
B60R2022/288 (EP,US);
B60R2022/289 (US);
B60R2022/3402 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | B60R22/34, B60R22/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSGURTAUFROLLER MIT EINER LASTBEGRENZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2019/05] | English: | SAFETY BELT RETRACTOR WITH A LOAD LIMITING DEVICE AND VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME | [2019/05] | French: | ENROULEUR DE CEINTURE DE SÉCURITÉ DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE LIMITATION DE CHARGE ET VÉHICULE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000016245 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0051]; figure - * [Y] 7,8,10,11; | [X]EP1491415 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,12,13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0075]; figure - *; | [Y]DE19814604 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7,10,11 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 23; figure - *; | [Y]EP0962365 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 * | International search | [A]CN104837687 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH) [A] 1-13 * description, paragraphs 0060-0117 and figures 3-11 *; | [A]CN101070061 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5626306 (MILLER III HAROLD J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007302074 (TAKATA CORP) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19640842 (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0842068 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |