EP3434285 - COMBINATIONS OF OBETICHOLIC ACID AND EZETIMIBE FOR THE TREATMENT OF NAFLD AND NASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/05] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2021/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waterstone Pharmaceuticals (Wuhan) Co., Ltd. B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430075 / CN | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiaoyu B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Faming B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 03 /
CUI, Jian B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Sihan B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Huojian B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 06 /
MENG, Yuan B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 07 /
LENG, Zhengwen B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | 08 /
QIAN, Lina B3-4 Biolake No. 666 Gaoxin Road Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430075 / CN | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17769488.2 | 24.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017CN78183 | Priority number, date | CN201610173317 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610173317 | [2019/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162211 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3434285 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3434285 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61K31/397, A61K45/06, A61P1/16, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, A61P9/00 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/397 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/397, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US) |
Former IPC [2019/05] | A61K45/06, A61K31/575, A61K31/397, A61P1/16, A61P35/00, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS OBETICHOLSÄURE UND EZETIMIB ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NAFLD UND NASH | [2021/13] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF OBETICHOLIC ACID AND EZETIMIBE FOR THE TREATMENT OF NAFLD AND NASH | [2021/13] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE L'ACIDE OBÉTICHOLIQUE ET DE L'EZETIMIBE DESTINÉES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA NAFLD ET DE LA NASH | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/05] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2019/05] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2019/05] | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET SES UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2018 | Translation filed | 27.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 30.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2017 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | IT | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | TR | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | LU | 24.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]RU2473342 ; | [XPI]CN105748487 ; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 30, Database accession no. 2013-B77345, XP002794127 & RU2473342 C1 20130127 (CHERKASHOVA E A) [X] 1-9,13,14 * abstract * [I] 1-14 | [XPI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 82, Database accession no. 2016-47093V, XP002794128 & CN105748487 A 20160713 (WATERSTONE BIOMEDICAL TECHNOLOGY WUHAN) [XP] 1-9,13,14 * abstract * [I] 1-14 | [Y] - SUNDER MUDALIAR ET AL, "Efficacy and Safety of the Farnesoid X Receptor Agonist Obeticholic Acid in Patients With Type 2 Diabetes and Nonalcoholic Fatty Liver Disease", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (20130901), vol. 145, no. 3, doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2013.05.042, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 574 - 582.e1, XP055086786 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 581, column 1, line 10 - line 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2013.05.042 | [Y] - YUMIE TAKESHITA ET AL, "The effects of ezetimibe on non-alcoholic fatty liver disease and glucose metabolism: a randomised controlled trial", DIABETOLOGIA, BERLIN, DE, (20140110), vol. 57, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s00125-013-3149-9, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 878 - 890, XP055620521 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-013-3149-9 | International search | [A]CN102451161 (LIYAN WANG) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *; | [A] - LI , PEIFENG, "Studies on Mechanism of Antiasthmatic and Anti-Inflammatory Actions of CDCA", CHINA JOURNAL OF CHINESE MATERIA MEDICA, (20040430), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 1001-5302, pages 349 - 352, XP009512534 [A] 1-14 | [A] - LIAO, XIANHUA et al., "Advances and Prognosis in the Treatment of Non-Alcoholic Fatty Liver Disease", Ganzang = CHINESE HEPATOLOGY, (20120430), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 280 - 283, XP009514074 [A] 1-14 | [A] - SU , YU et al., "Lipid-Lowering and Pleiotropic Effects of Ezetimibe Co-Administration", CHINESE JOURNAL OF NEW DRUGS, (20100831), vol. 19, no. 8, pages 666 - 670, XP9513300 [A] 1-14 |