EP3435025 - MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enplas Corporation 2-30-1 Namiki Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0034 / JP | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Tomohiro c/o Enplas Corporation 2-30-1 Namiki Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17769823.0 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017JP07601 | Priority number, date | JP20160058546 | 23.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016058546 | [2019/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017163778 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435025 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01B11/26, G02B3/00, G02B3/04, G02B3/06, G02B27/18, G03B35/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G01B11/002 (EP);
G01B11/26 (US);
G01B11/00 (US);
G02B27/18 (US);
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/06 (US);
G03B35/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | G01B11/00, G01B11/26, G02B3/00, G03B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | MARKER | [2019/05] | English: | MARKER | [2019/05] | French: | MARQUEUR | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 31.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008111579 (NAGASHIMA MICHIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-3, 6, 19, 26-28 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0062] , [0066] , [0082] , [0083] , [0107] *; | [X]US2013270813 (HOFFMULLER WINFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 3-10 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] - [23.27] - [0044] - [0058] - [0092] - [0 97] *; | [XI]WO2015141601 (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1B * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0007] , [0008] , [0012] - [0017] - [0026] - [0028] - [0031] - [0035] - [0060] , [0066] *[I] 3 | International search | [A]JP2000321509 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraph [0009] (Family: none) *; | [A]US6369949 (CONLEY KENNETH E [US]) [A] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [X]WO2008111579 (NAGASHIMA MICHIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * , claims 8, 9; paragraphs [0002] to [0008], [0062] to [0066], [0082] to [0083], [0107]; fig. 1 to 3, 6, 19, 24, 26 to 28 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011176715 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0066] to [0067] & US 2011/0279727 A1 paragraphs [0099] to [0100] *; | [A]JP2013025043 (GRAPAC JAPAN KK) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2016536645 (3M Innovative Properties Co.) [PA] 1-3 * , paragraph [0076]; fig. 11 & US 2016/0202409 A1 paragraph [0102]; fig. 11 & WO 2015/034896 A1 & EP 3042224 A1 & TW 201523025 A & CN 105492933 A & KR 10-2016-0052622 A * |