EP3434690 - ANTIBODY THAT BINDS TO ENVELOPE GLYCOPROTEIN OF SEVERE FEVER WITH THROMBOCYTOPENIA SYNDROME VIRUS, AND USE FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul National University R&DB Foundation 1 Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | For all designated states Institut Pasteur Korea 16 Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi 13488 / KR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Junho T-1801 170 Seohyeon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13590 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ki-Hyun A-1003 32 Gukjegeumyung-ro 7-gil Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07341 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyori 310-303 435 Olympic-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05507 / KR | 04 /
OH, Myoung-don 101 Daehak-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03080 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Wan Beom 101 Daehak-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03080 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Seungtaek 201-504, 847, Bugaksan-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02818 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Jinhee 110-103, 190, Bundang-ro Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggo-do 13581 / KR | 08 /
MIN, Ji-Young 9717 Singleton Dr. Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 09 /
KO, Meehyun 632, 767, Sinsu-ro, Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
CHUNG, Junho T-1801 170 Seohyeon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13590 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Ki-Hyun A-1003 32 Gukjegeumyung-ro 7-gil Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07341 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Hyori 310-303 435 Olympic-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05507 / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Myoung-don 101 Daehak-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03080 / KR | |||
05 /
PARK, Wan Beom 101 Daehak-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03080 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Seungtaek 201-504, 847, Bugaksan-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02818 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Jinhee 110-103, 190, Bundang-ro Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggo-do 13581 / KR | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17770648.8 | 23.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017KR03156 | Priority number, date | KR20160034727 | 23.03.2016 Original published format: KR 20160034727 | [2019/05] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017164678 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3434690 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/10, C07K14/175, C07K14/005, G01N33/543, G01N33/569, G01N35/00, A61K39/42 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
A61K39/42 (EP,US);
C07K16/10 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P31/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (KR,US);
C07K14/175 (EP,US);
C07K16/1003 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (KR);
G01N33/56983 (KR,US);
G01N35/00029 (US);
G01N35/0098 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C12N2760/12211 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | C07K16/10, C07K14/005, G01N33/543, G01N33/569, G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | AN HÜLLGLYKOPROTEIN VON SCHWEREM-FIEBER-MIT-THROMBOZYTOPENIE-SYNDROM-VIRUS BINDENDER ANTIKÖRPER SOWIE VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2019/05] | English: | ANTIBODY THAT BINDS TO ENVELOPE GLYCOPROTEIN OF SEVERE FEVER WITH THROMBOCYTOPENIA SYNDROME VIRUS, AND USE FOR SAME | [2019/05] | French: | ANTICORPS QUI SE LIE À LA PROTÉINE D'ENVELOPPE DU VIRUS DU SYNDROME DE FIÈVRE SÉVÈRE AVEC THROMBOCYTOPÉNIE, ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | Translation filed | 07.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02051870 (GRAD CAROLE [CA], et al); | [A]WO03064606 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004006955 (FOOTE JEFFERSON [US]); | [A]WO2006089231 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010045388 (DYAX CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2010059543 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [A]WO2010061991 (KOREA RES INST OF BIOSCIENCE [KR], et al); | [A]WO2010107752 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010141249 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [A]US2011091960 (SIEGEL DONALD L [US]); | [A]WO2011071783 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2012048340 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | [A]WO2012076066 (BIOINVENT INT AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2012098089 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012170438 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2013063095 (ABBVIE INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2013092998 (INNATE PHARMA [FR], et al); | International search | [A]CN102942629 (JIANGSU PROVINCIAL CT FOR DISEASE PREVENTION AND CONTROL); | [A]WO2015053455 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]); | by applicant | WO2015053455 |