Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019137158 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310888 | 21.03.2016 | US201816136452 | 20.09.2018 | WO2017US23356 | 21.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019516053 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662310888 | 21.03.2016 | WO2017US23356 | 21.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3018324 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310888 | 21.03.2016 | WO2017US23356 | 21.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3433334 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | A4 | EP3433334 | 30.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310888 | 21.03.2016 | WO2017US23356 | 21.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017165378 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310888 | 21.03.2016 |