EP3433334 - THERMAL RECUPERATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rebound Technologies, Inc. 5690 East 56th Avenue, Unit F Commerce City, CO 80022 / US | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDFARBMUREN, Russell 3609 North Garfield Street Denver, Colorado 80205 / US | 02 /
ERICKSON, Luke 3010 Kearney Street Denver, Colorado 80207 / US | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17770960.7 | 21.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017US23356 | Priority number, date | US201662310888P | 21.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662310888 P | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017165378 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433334 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/00, C09K5/20, F25B17/10, F28C3/00, F28D7/00, C09K5/06 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C09K5/00 (EP,US);
F25C1/00 (US);
C09K5/066 (EP);
C09K5/20 (EP,US);
F25C5/18 (US);
F28D2021/0042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | C09K5/00, C09K5/20, F25B17/10, F28C3/00, F28D7/00, H01M8/04029 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | THERMISCHE RÜCKGEWINNUNGSVERFAHREN, -SYSTEME UND -VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/05] | English: | THERMAL RECUPERATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES | [2019/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES, ET DISPOSITIFS DE RÉCUPÉRATION THERMIQUE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012036166 (MITSUYA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,5* the whole document * | International search | [XY]US4584843 (PRONGER JR OLIVER M [US], et al) [X] 16-20 * , Fig. 1; col 2, In 4-12; col 2, In 41-62; col 4, In 56 to col 5, In 47; col 6, In 24 to col 7, In 21 * [Y] 2, 7-15; | [Y]JPH01252838 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-20* , English Abstract only *; | [Y]US6253116 (ZHANG WEI [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , col 2, In 62 to col 9, In 52 *; | [XY]US2013199753 (MUREN RUSSELL [US]) [X] 1, 3-6 * , Fig. 1B; para [0008], [0013], [0018], [0019], [0048], [0103]-[0105] * [Y] 2, 7-15; | [Y]US2013327407 (HERMANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , para [0001]-[0063] * |