EP3451323 - ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE CIRCUIT, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Chunping No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
XIAN, Jianbo No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/10] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 17771326.0 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017CN76649 | Priority number, date | CN201620363192U | 26.04.2016 Original published format: CN 201620363192 U | [2019/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017185894 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3451323 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3451323 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H02H9/00, H01L27/02, G02F1/1362, H01L27/12 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H01L27/0266 (EP,US);
G02F1/136204 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
H01L27/0248 (US);
H01L27/0296 (EP);
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
H01L27/1251 (US);
H02H9/00 (US);
G02F1/1345 (US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0209 (EP,US);
G09G2330/04 (EP,US);
H10K59/1213 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | G09G3/36, H02H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHE ENTLADUNGSSCHALTUNG, ARRAYSUBSTRAT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/10] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE CIRCUIT, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/10] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉCHARGE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE, SUBSTRAT DE RÉSEAU ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2017 | Translation filed | 02.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 08.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22192975.5 / EP4120235 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IE | 14.03.2023 | LU | 14.03.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 14.03.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 14.03.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 14.03.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5373377 (OGAWA MEIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 51 * * column 8, line 45 - column 10, line 25 * [I] 3-13; | [A]WO2004072941 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 9, line 7 - page 11, line 35 *; | [A]US2007246778 (LIOU MENG-CHI [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] *; | [A]US2013120334 (KIM HYUNG-TAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0098] - [0101] * | International search | [A]US2002131003 (MATSUMOTO KIMIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101517629 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]CN102651366 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0016]-[0019], and [0023], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN102651547 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN205621414U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0044]-[0107], and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN205665504U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1, 2, 20, 21 * description, paragraphs [0040]-[0044] * |