EP3509733 - COMPOSITE POWDER WITH MICROSTRUCTURED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/29] | CALCIUM-SALT-CONTAINING COMPOSITE POWDER HAVING MICROSTRUCTURED PARTICLES | ||
[2020/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG Louise-Seher-Strasse 6 65582 Diez / DE | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VUCAK, Marijan Lahnstraße 3 65624 Altendiez / DE | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 64 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 17771689.1 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP72414 | Priority number, date | EP20160001952 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16001952 | [2019/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018046574 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509733 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509733 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/32, A61L27/18, A61L27/10, A61L27/00, A61L27/44, C09C1/02, C09C1/00, C08J3/12, B01J2/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A61L27/446 (EP);
C08L67/04 (US);
A61L27/00 (RU);
A61L27/10 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L27/32 (RU);
A61L27/44 (RU);
B01J2/00 (RU);
C08J3/12 (EP,RU);
C08J3/128 (EP);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/32 (US);
C09C1/00 (RU);
C09C1/0081 (EP);
C09C1/02 (EP,RU);
C09C1/021 (EP);
C01P2002/90 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/11 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C08J2323/00 (EP);
C08J2367/04 (EP);
C08K2003/265 (US);
C08K2003/325 (US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | B01J2/00, C08J3/12, C09C1/00, C09C1/02, A61L27/44, A61L27/00, A61L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CALCIUMSALZ-ENTHALTENDES VERBUNDPULVER MIT MIKROSTRUKTURIERTEN TEILCHEN | [2019/29] | English: | COMPOSITE POWDER WITH MICROSTRUCTURED PARTICLES | [2020/11] | French: | POUDRE COMPOSITE AVEC PARTICULES MICROSTRUCTURÉES | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/29] | CALCIUM-SALT-CONTAINING COMPOSITE POWDER HAVING MICROSTRUCTURED PARTICLES | ||
Former [2019/29] | POUDRE COMPOSITE À PARTICULES MICROSTRUCTURÉES CONTENANT UN SEL DE CALCIUM | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 08.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2021
10.02.2022
WITHDRAWN Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Glas, Holger Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2021
10.02.2022
WITHDRAWN Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2021
26.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 10.05.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 23.05.2022 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | LU | 07.09.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 22.07.2020 | |
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | LT | 22.07.2020 | |
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 22.07.2020 | |
NO | 22.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2012126600 (SCHAEFER KALK GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-16 * pages 39-42 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y] - NAVARRO M ET AL, "Development and cell response of a new biodegradable composite scaffold for guided bone regeneration", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20040401), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1023/B:JMSM.0000021113.88702.9D, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 419 - 422, XP019212038 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:JMSM.0000021113.88702.9d | by applicant | JPS6283029 | EP0523372 | DE4244254 | EP0922488 | US6403219 | WO2008122358 | WO2012126600 | - Römpp-Lexikon Chemie, Thieme, (19970000), vol. 2 | - "Ausschütteln von Lösungen bzw. Suspensionen", Organikum, VEB Deutscher Verlag der Wissenschaften, (19880000), pages 56 - 57 | Opposition | EP0358798 | US2005177245 | WO2006050119 | US2011160322 | WO2012126600 | US2013190441 | WO2014030497 | EP3020424 | WO2018046574 | EP3509654 | - CIJUN SHUAI et al., "Development of composite porous scaffolds based on poly(lactide-co-glycolide)/nano-hydroxyapatite via selective laser sintering", Int J Adv Manuf Technol, (20130000), vol. 69, pages 51 - 57, XP055803275 | - YOUNGMEE JUNG et al., "A poly(lactic acid)/calcium metaphosphate composite for bone tissue engineering", Biomaterials, (20050000), vol. 26, pages 6314 - 6322, XP0027767596 | - CIJUN SHUAI et al., "Poly (I-lactide acid) improves complete nano- hydroxyapatite bone scaffolds through the microstructure rearrangement", Electronic Journal of Biotechnology, (20121115), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1 - 7, XP055803334 | - YANG XU et al., "Preparation of porous nanocomposite scaffolds with honeycomb monolith structure by one phase solution freeze- drying method", Chinese Journal of Polymer Science, (20110000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 215 - 224, XP055803367 | - MAHBOUBEH JAFARKHANI et al., "Fabrication and Characterization of PLLA/Chitosan/Nano Calcium Phosphate Scaffolds by Freeze- Casting Technique", Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (20120000), vol. 51, pages 9241 - 9249, XP055803376 | - S.M. ZHAN G et al., "Interfacial fabrication and property of hydroxyapatite/polylactide resorbable bone fixation composites", Current Applied Physics, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 516 - 518, XP055803380 |