EP3473744 - MASK PLATE AND ASSEMBLY METHOD FOR MASK PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Ordos Yuansheng Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. Ordos Equipment Manufacturing Base Dongsheng District Ordos, Inner Mongolia 017020 / CN | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zhiming No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhen No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17771973.9 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017CN74774 | Priority number, date | CN201610438013 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610438013 | [2019/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017215286 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473744 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473744 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/04, C23C14/24, C23C14/12, H01L51/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C23C14/042 (EP,CN,US);
B05B12/20 (US);
B05C21/005 (US);
B05D1/32 (US);
C23C14/12 (EP,CN);
C23C14/24 (CN,US);
C23C16/042 (US);
C30B25/04 (US);
H05K3/143 (US);
H10K71/00 (EP,CN,US);
H10K71/191 (EP,CN);
G03F1/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | C23C14/04, C23C14/24, C23C14/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASKENPLATTE UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN FÜR MASKENPLATTE | [2019/17] | English: | MASK PLATE AND ASSEMBLY METHOD FOR MASK PLATE | [2019/17] | French: | PLAQUE DE MASQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE POUR PLAQUE DE MASQUE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2017 | Translation filed | 04.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN103938153 (KUNSHAN POWER STENCIL CO LTD); | [X]US2015101536 (HAN JEONG WON [KR]); | [Y]CN105002464 (AU OPTRONICS CORP) | International search | [X]CN203034082U (RAINBOW FOSHAN FLAT PANEL DISPLAY CO LTD); | [A]CN103668049 (KUNSHAN POWER STENCIL CO LTD); | [XY]CN103695841 (KUNSHAN POWER STENCIL CO LTD); | [Y]CN204529949U (SHANGHAI TIANMA ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [X]CN105039907 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT); | [A]CN105063552 (KUNSHAN POWER STENCIL CO LTD); | [PX]CN105839052 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) |