EP3474825 - SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION COMPRISING TIZANIDINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santa Farma Ilaç Sanayi A.S. Okmeydani Boru çiçegi Sok. No:16 Sisli 34382 Istanbul / TR | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILHAN, Doga Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi, Kocaeli / TR | 02 /
AKTAS, Tolga Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi, Kocaeli / TR | 03 /
MOLLAOGLU, Fatih Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi, Kocaeli / TR | 04 /
KANIK, Bayram Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi, Kocaeli / TR | 05 /
ÖNER, Levent Zirvekent 2. Etap C2 Blok D:20 Çankaya, Ankara / TR | [2019/24] |
Former [2019/18] | 01 /
ILHAN, Doga Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi Kocaeli / TR | ||
02 /
AKTAS, Tolga Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi Kocaeli / TR | |||
03 /
MOLLAOGLU, Fatih Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Gebkim Kimya Ihtisas Osb Çerkesli Yolu Üzeri Erol Kiresepi Cad. No:8 Dilovasi Kocaeli / TR | |||
04 /
KANIK, Bayram Santa Farma Ilaç Fabrikasi Sofali Çesme Sok. No: 72-74 Edirnekapi Istanbul / TR | |||
05 /
ÖNER, Levent Zirvekent 2. Etap C2 Blok D:20 Çankaya Ankara / TR | Representative(s) | Bulut, Pinar Farmapatent Limited GMK Bulvari No: 42/5 Maltepe 06440 Ankara / TR | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17772138.8 | 21.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017TR50280 | Priority number, date | TR20160008644 | 22.06.2016 Original published format: TR 201608644 | [2019/18] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222488 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474825 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3474825 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K31/433 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/433 (EP);
A61K9/5042 (EP);
A61K9/5078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RETARD-FORMULIERUNG MIT TIZANIDIN | [2019/18] | English: | SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION COMPRISING TIZANIDINE | [2019/18] | French: | FORMULATION À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE COMPRENANT DE LA TIZANIDINE | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 17.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2017 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 21.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 21.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008003093 (QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] ** example 25 *; | [YD]US2016030399 (PELLEGRINI CARA A [US], et al) [YD] 1-17 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * examples 1-5 * * tables 1-10 * * claims 36, 38, 39, 45-54 *; | [YD] - THRIVENI M ET AL, "Design and evaluation of sustained release multiparticulate system of Tizanidine hydrochloride", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES AND RESEARCH - IJPSR, SOCIETY OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES AND RESEARCH, IN, (20130401), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.13040/IJPSR.0975-8232.4(4).1614-25, ISSN 0975-8232, page 1614, XP009501370 [YD] 1-17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 1615, column r, line 18 - page 1616, column l, line 9 * * tables 1,2,7 * * figures 3-6,8-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13040/IJPSR.0975-8232.4(4).1614-25 | by applicant | WO2006102965 | US2014341985 | US2015038539 | US2016030399 | - THRIVENI et al., IJPSR, (20130000), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 1614 - 1625 |