EP3520234 - USE OF UPLINK BEAM TRACKING RESULTS IN REFERENCE SYMBOL SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SADIQ, Bilal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SAMPATH, Ashwin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LI, Junyi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
RAGHAVAN, Vasanthan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/46] |
Former [2019/32] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17772279.0 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US51764 | Priority number, date | US201662401794P | 29.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662401794 P | US201715618969 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US201715618969 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018063824 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520234 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3520234 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04B7/0621 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04W16/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON UPLINK-STRAHLVERFOLGUNGSERGEBNISSEN IN REFERENZSYMBOLSITZUNGEN | [2019/32] | English: | USE OF UPLINK BEAM TRACKING RESULTS IN REFERENCE SYMBOL SESSIONS | [2019/32] | French: | UTILISATION DE RÉSULTATS DE SUIVI DE FAISCEAU DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS DES SESSIONS DE SYMBOLES DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 26.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015009951 (JOSIAM KAUSHIK [US], et al) [X] 1,9,17,25 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0080] * * table 1 * [I] 2-8,10-16,18-24,26-30; | [I]US2016261325 (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al) [I] 1-30 * paragraph [0237] - paragraph [0269] ** figure 24 * | Examination | US2015049824 |