EP3516341 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL TESTING OF A FIBRE-OPTIC SENSOR AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOS4X GmbH Thalkirchner Str. 210 81371 München / DE | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Mathias Dr.-Hammerschmidt-Platz 11a 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17772622.1 | 11.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017EP72750 | Priority number, date | DE201610117691 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016117691 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018054707 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516341 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01D18/00, G01H9/00, G01L1/24, G01P15/093, G01P21/00, G01D5/353 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G01L1/24 (EP,US);
G01H9/004 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
G01D18/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/353 (EP,US);
G01P15/093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FUNKTIONSPRÜFUNG EINES FASEROPTISCHEN SENSORS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2019/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL TESTING OF A FIBRE-OPTIC SENSOR AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VÉRIFICATION DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CAPTEUR À FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 18.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2440955 (INSENSYS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 31 - page 8, line 8 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [XAI]DE102007035847 (IPRM INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY RIG [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] * * paragraph [0051]; figure 1b * * claims 10,11 * [A] 7 [I] 4-6,12,14; | [A]DE102010049780 (LIOS TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0037]; figure 4 ** paragraph [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2012206718 (JAASKELAINEN MIKKO [US]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0029]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figure 4 * |