EP3436735 - MULTI-DIRECTIONAL MOUNTING BRACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Engineering Pty Ltd 130 - 140 Melrose Drive Tullamarine, Victoria 3043 / AU | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIJOFF, Michael c/- 130 - 140 Melrose Drive Tullamarine, Victoria 3043 / AU | 02 /
LADEWIG, Mark 156-160 Memorial Drive Plenty, Victoria 3090 / AU | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Roberts, David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | Roberts, David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17772878.9 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017AU50274 | Priority number, date | AU20160901190 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: AU 2016901190 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017165920 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436735 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/14, F16M13/02, F16C11/06, F21V21/14, F16L27/04, F16L27/02 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
F16C11/10 (EP,US);
F16C11/0609 (EP,US);
F16C11/0623 (EP,US);
F16C11/0642 (EP,US);
F16C11/0647 (EP,US);
F16M11/14 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (EP,US);
F21V21/28 (EP,US);
H04R1/026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | MULTIDIREKTIONALE MONTAGEKLAMMER | [2019/06] | English: | MULTI-DIRECTIONAL MOUNTING BRACKET | [2019/06] | French: | SUPPORT DE MONTAGE MULTIDIRECTIONNEL | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 12.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003174855 (HAWKINS BERNIE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 4-5 * * paragraph [0017] * | International search | [X]US2010236020 (TSAI CHIA-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * Abstract, Figs 1-9, paragraphs [0028]-[0038] *; | [X]US2007138358 (CHANG TA S [TW]) [X] 1-15 * Figs 1-8, paragraphs [0022]-[0025] *; | [X]US5280871 (CHUANG CHING-PAO [TW]) [X] 1-15 * Figs 1-5, column 1 line 55 to column 2 line 50 *; | [A]US3841769 (BOWERMAN W) [A] 0; | [A]US5588767 (MERLO WERNER O [CA]) [A] 0 |