EP3448760 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING WRAPPED BALES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cross Wrap OY Teollisuustie 6 71800 Siilinjärvi / FI | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIVELÄ, Kalle Tuoppitie 1 73310 TAHKOVUORI / FI | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 17773369.8 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017FI50231 | Priority number, date | FI20160005273 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: FI 20165273 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017168056 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448760 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/58, B65B11/06, B65B27/12, A01F15/07, B65B11/00, B65B11/04, B65B11/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B65B27/125 (EP,FI,US);
B65B11/58 (EP,FI,US);
B65B11/008 (EP);
B65B11/025 (EP,US);
B65B11/045 (EP);
B65B11/06 (FI);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | B65B11/58, B65B11/06, B65B27/12, A01F15/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG GEWICKELTER BALLEN | [2019/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING WRAPPED BALES | [2019/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE BALLES ENVELOPPÉES | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 24.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1142787 (MATSUMOTO SYSTEM ENGINEERING C [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11,14 * figures 15, 17-19, 29 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0 65] , [0 88] - [0106] * [Y] 6,15 [I] 4,8,12,13; | [Y]WO2011051572 (CROSS WRAP OY [FI], et al) [Y] 6,15 * figures 1-3 * * page 8, lines 10-21 *; | [A]EP2835314 (ONTEX BVBA [BE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0012] * * claims 1-5 * | International search | [AXY]WO2011051572 (CROSS WRAP OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1, 9, 14-16; figures 1 and 7 * [X] 13, 19-25 [Y] 14-18, 26; | [Y]EP1142787 (MATSUMOTO SYSTEM ENGINEERING C [JP]) [Y] 17, 18, 26 * paragraphs [0007], [0042]; claim 1; figure 15 *; | [Y]EP2835314 (ONTEX BVBA [BE]) [Y] 14-16 * paragraph [0012], claims 1-5, figures 1-2 * | by applicant | WO9422717 | EP1142787 | WO2011051572 | EP2496068 |