EP3438646 - IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAO, Isamu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KISHIMOTO, Takuya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
KISHII, Noriyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17773534.7 | 20.01.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP01858 | Priority number, date | JP20160063744 | 28.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016063744 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017168984 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438646 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
G01N21/4795 (EP);
G01N21/47 (US);
A61B5/0059 (US);
A61B5/0261 (US);
G01N2021/479 (EP,US);
G01N21/49 (EP);
G06T2207/30101 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ABBILDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/06] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGING METHOD | [2019/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | Translation filed | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008287808 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050] * [Y] 3,6,7,10,13,14 [I] 4,11; | [Y] - ZIMNYAKOV D A ET AL, "FULL-FIELD SPECKLE TECHNIQUES IN BLOOD MICROCIRCULATION MONITORING", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2004 - 20-1-2004; SAN JOSE,, (20001003), vol. 4241, doi:10.1117/12.431548, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 370 - 377, XP008004834 [Y] 3,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.431548 | [Y] - AMAAN MAZHAR ET AL, "Laser speckle imaging in the spatial frequency domain", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, United States, (20110601), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.1364/BOE.2.001553, ISSN 2156-7085, page 1553, XP055532780 [Y] 6,7,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [001.] - paragraph [004.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/BOE.2.001553 | [A] - XIYI CHEN ET AL, "Lateral laser speckle contrast analysis combined with line beam scanning illumination to improve the sampling depth of blood flow imaging", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, vol. 37, no. 18, doi:10.1364/OL.37.003774, ISSN 0146-9592, (20120915), pages 3774 - 3776, (20120906), XP001578494 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.37.003774 | International search | [Y]JP2005515818 (Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen) [Y] 1-5, 8-12 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0010], [0036], [0081] to [0085]; fig. 7a & US 2005/0187477 A1 paragraphs [0007] to [0015], [0053], [0096] to [0100]; fig. 7a & GB 2402286 A & WO 2003/063677 A1 & EP 1332718 A1 & DE 10392250 T *; | [XA]JP2010503475 (The General Hospital Corp.) [X] 1-5, 8-12 * , paragraphs [0002], [0015] to [0017], [0025] to [0028], [0035] & US 2008/0287808 A1 paragraphs [0002], [0029] to [0031], [0039] to [0042], [0049] & WO 2008/033909 A2 & EP 2077753 A1 * [A] 6, 7, 13, 14; | [YA]WO2014116483 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG], et al) [Y] 1-5, 8-12 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0034], [0037], [0038], [0040]; fig. 3B, 5 & JP 2016-509509 A & US 2014/0206980 A1 & EP 2948052 A1 & CA 2898708 A & AU 2014209741 A & CN 105188523 A & KR 10-2015-0135241 A & MX 2015009381 A * [A] 6, 7, 13, 14; | [Y]JP2015527096 (Koninklijke Philips N.V.) [Y] 1-5, 8-12* , paragraphs [0001], [0010] & US 2015/0323311 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0009] & WO 2013/185937 A1 & EP 2861935 A1 & CN 104620073 A & RU 2014145319 A * |