EP3438064 - GLASS PANEL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co, Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
URIU, Eiichi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co, Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co, Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NONAKA, Masataka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co, Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
ISHIBASHI, Tasuku c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co, Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17774275.6 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP10144 | Priority number, date | JP20160072501 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016072501 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017169731 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438064 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3438064 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/06, E06B3/663, E06B3/66, E06B3/67, B32B17/06, B32B17/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
E06B3/66304 (EP,US);
C03C17/32 (US);
C03C27/06 (EP,US);
E06B3/6612 (EP,US);
E06B3/66333 (US);
E06B3/66342 (US);
E06B3/67334 (US);
E06B3/6775 (US);
Y02A30/249 (EP,US);
Y02B80/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | C03C27/06, E06B3/663, E06B3/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBE | [2019/06] | English: | GLASS PANEL UNIT | [2019/06] | French: | UNITÉ PANNEAU DE VERRE | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 27.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP19198658.7 / EP3611142 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5270084 (PARKER KENNETH R [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 1 - line 18; claim 1 * [I] 3; | [A]US2002106463 (WANG YEI-PING MIMI H [US]) [A] 1-3* claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP2851351 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0043] *; | [XP]WO2016084383 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1 * example - * | International search | [A]JPH11100240 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11130475 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11130476 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004513273 (Truseal Technologies, Inc.) [A] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings & JP 5541829 B2 & US 2003/0150177 A1 & US 2006/0101739 A1 & WO 2002/038903 A1 & CA 2428826 A & BR 115655 A & SK 5652003 A & NZ 525775 A & PL 362565 A & HU 301546 A & UA 78691 C & CN 1486392 A & RO 122158 B & KR 10-0808429 B1 & AU 2001268206 B & MX PA03004067 A & ES 2567127 T & DK 1341982 T & CY 1117648 T *; | [A]WO2014136152 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH11311069 |