EP3438506 - ELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/06] | SENSOR TARGET, MOVABLE PART UNIT PROVIDED WITH SAID TARGET, AND ELECTRIC ACTUATOR | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUTO, Takushi c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Shinsuke c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Atsushi c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 04 /
ISHIKAWA, Tomomi c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17774830.8 | 24.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP12196 | Priority number, date | JP20160069096 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016069096 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017170293 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438506 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3438506 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20, F16H25/24, G01D5/12, G01D5/245, H02K7/06, G01D5/14, G01D11/24 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
F16H25/24 (EP,US);
F16H25/2454 (US);
F16H25/20 (US);
F16H25/2015 (EP);
F16H25/2204 (US);
G01D5/12 (US);
G01D5/145 (EP);
G01D5/245 (US);
H02K7/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | F16H25/20, F16H25/24, G01D5/12, G01D5/245, H02K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER AKTUATOR | [2023/19] | English: | ELECTRIC ACTUATOR | [2023/19] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/06] | SENSORZIEL, BEWEGLICHES TEIL MIT DIESEM ZIEL UND ELEKTRISCHER AKTUATOR | ||
Former [2019/06] | SENSOR TARGET, MOVABLE PART UNIT PROVIDED WITH SAID TARGET, AND ELECTRIC ACTUATOR | ||
Former [2019/06] | CIBLE DE CAPTEUR, UNITÉ DE PIÈCE MOBILE DOTÉE DE LADITE CIBLE, ET ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | Translation filed | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 04.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2005009996 (SAKAE TSUSHIN KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3,4 [Y] 5-8; | [Y]EP1832851 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-8* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04141611 (CANON KK) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005009996 (SAKAE TSUSHIN KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 5-8 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0014]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2014232035 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 1-2, 5-8 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0021]; fig. 1 to 12 & US 2014/0353071 A1 paragraphs [0024] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 14 & EP 2816321 A1 & CN 104210535 A * [A] 3-4; | [A]JP2015117787 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2017038318 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-8* , (Family: none) * |