Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11343499 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2021144375 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | US202017123871 | 16.12.2020 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | US201816090004 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11343498 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2021105471 | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | US202017123639 | 16.12.2020 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | US201816090004 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11343497 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2021105470 | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | US202017123496 | 16.12.2020 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | US201816090004 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10904526 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2021 | B2 | US2019222843 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102583092B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B1 | KR20230018544 | 07.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20227005364 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102492809B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2023 | B1 | KR20220025289 | 03.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20187025012 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102365964B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | B1 | KR20180121514 | 07.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114598865 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201780020638 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108886613B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2022 | B | CN108886613 | 23.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3439304 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2020 | A4 | EP3439304 | 06.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2710807 | 27.03.2020 | B1 | ES2710807R | 10.07.2019 | R1 | ES2710807 | 26.04.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | WO2017KR03357 | 28.03.2017 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017171370 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2739668 | 03.12.2021 | B1 | ES2739668R | 13.11.2020 | R1 | ES2739668 | 03.02.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2817100 | 13.04.2022 | B1 | ES2817100R | 03.06.2021 | R1 | ES2817100 | 06.04.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20160036844 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036846 | 28.03.2016 | KR20160036841 | 28.03.2016 |