Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11485971 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | B2 | US2019194653 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IL51043 | 14.09.2017 | US201662394324 | 14.09.2016 | US201662421503 | 14.11.2016 | US201662427325 | 29.11.2016 | US201716330774 | 14.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3512943 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2023 | B1 | EP3512943 | 24.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IL51043 | 14.09.2017 | US201662394324 | 14.09.2016 | US201662421503 | 14.11.2016 | US201662427325 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018051347 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662394324 | 14.09.2016 | US201662421503 | 14.11.2016 | US201662427325 | 29.11.2016 |